Nash, Martin (CPSO#: 18303)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: March 11, 2004
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On March 11, 2004, Dr. Martin Nash signed the following undertaking to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

I, Dr. Martin Nash, undertake to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, no later than June 1, 2004.

I promise not to apply for registration as a physician or a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

I consent to this undertaking being entered in the register as information that is available to the public.

I acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario has agreed to withdraw the allegation that Dr. Nash engaged in impropriety with a patient as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated August 21, 2003, which allegation of professional misconduct is currently pending before the Discipline Committee.

I have obtained independent legal advice before giving this undertaking.

The CPSO withdrew the allegation of professional misconduct on August 16, 2004.