Nash, Wesley Scott (CPSO#: 66405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
107 King Street West
Suite 204
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone: (905) 627-3505
Fax: (905) 627-4193
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.S. Nash and M.P. O'Malley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Nash ( CPSO# 66405 )
Dr. M. O'Malley ( CPSO# 66407 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
107 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone Number: (905) 627-3505

Business Address:
Suite 200
34 Stone Church Road West
Ancaster ON  L9K 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 304-1122

Business Address:
Suite 8-9
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 336-9624

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WESLEY SCOTT NASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1995