Nasmith, Louise Lillian Mullins (CPSO#: 57660)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007