Nasr El Hag Ali, Maha (CPSO#: 98486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Feb 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
R. Fraser Elliott Building
Room 3-805
190 Elizabeth St 190 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 978-0289
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHA NASR EL HAG ALI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. NASR EL HAG ALI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. NASR EL HAG ALI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NASR EL HAG ALI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. NASR EL HAG ALI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. NASR EL HAG ALI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. NASR EL HAG ALI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018