Nasri, Masood Ahmad (CPSO#: 85491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Aug 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 3829
Fax: (519) 749-4307
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

65 Bridgeport Road East
Waterloo ON  N2J2K1
Canada
Phone: 519-725-7635
Fax: 226-475-0113
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Nasri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nasri ( CPSO# 85491 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Aug 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Nov 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Oct 2007

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2007 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Masood Ahmad Nasri may practise independently in the area of Psychiatry.