Nassar, Aussama Khalaf (CPSO#: 84976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Pasteur Drive, H3635
Stanford CA  94305
United States
Phone: (650) 725-1097
Fax: (650) 725-1216
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aussama Nassar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nassar ( CPSO# 84976 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site 6 North-Room 606
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2617

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Charlton Campus
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 525-1155

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AUSSAMA KHALAF NASSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASSAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Apr 2012 to 27 May 2012
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011