Nasser, Kasim Reda (CPSO#: 94957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102A
1 CentrePointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 596-1320
Fax: (613) 596-3933
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kasim Nasser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nasser ( CPSO# 94957 )
Dr. S. Mohammed ( CPSO# 94730 )

Business Address:
Suite 102A
1 Centrepoint Drive
Nepean ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 596-1320

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KASIM REDA NASSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASSER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2012