Nassir, Anmar Mohammed (CPSO#: 76828)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 24 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Urology Effective: 20 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004