Nassr, Donald Gregory (CPSO#: 18107)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Aug 2011