Natarajan, Madhu Kailash (CPSO#: 60828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-6241
Fax: (905) 527-2337
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Natarajan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Natarajan ( CPSO# 60828 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-6241

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MADHU KAILASH NATARAJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NATARAJAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1990