Natarajan, Monika Nandini (CPSO#: 68335)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Aug 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Mar 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013