Nath, Rovindra Robin (CPSO#: 65474)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CMH Medical Centre
Suite 111
1315 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Phone: (416) 631-6888
Fax: (416) 631-6887
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROVINDRA ROBIN NATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NATH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993