Nathoo, Munir Fatehali Amarsi (CPSO#: 67924)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3050 Garden Street
Unit 104
Whitby ON  L1R 2G7
Phone: (905) 430-5305
Fax: (905) 430-6416
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Munir Nathoo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nathoo ( CPSO# 67924 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
3050 Garden Street
Whitby ON  L1R 2G7
Phone Number: (905) 430-5305

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUNIR FATEHALI AMARSI NATHOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NATHOO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996