Naudie, Douglas de Lotbiniere (CPSO#: 71184)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Room A9-028
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3407
Fax: (519) 663-3420
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas D. Naudie Medicine Professonal Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Naudie ( CPSO# 71184 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
Suite A9-028
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3407

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS DE LOTBINIERE NAUDIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAUDIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002