Navajas, Eduardo Vitor (CPSO#: 87133)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eduardo Navajas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital, Queens University, 166 Brock Street, Kingston, ON K7L 5G2
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 03 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
International Specialist Physician - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015