Navaratnam, Nagaratnam (CPSO#: 87488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: Ganesanandan, Nagaratnam (used until: 03 Feb 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Tamil

Education:Patrice Lumumba People's Friendship Univ, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
360 Medical Centre
360 Highway 7 East,Unit 6.
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Y7
Phone: (905) 881-0360
Fax: (905) 881-3601
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tower Hill Medical Centre
380 Tower Hill Road,Unit 17,
Richmond Hill ON  L4E0T8
Canada
Phone: 2894756104
Fax: 905 7709579
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAGARATNAM NAVARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAVARATNAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2007 to 17 Oct 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2015