Navarro, Joaquin Ximo Ruiz (CPSO#: 28144)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 11 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: Ruiz-Navarro, Joaquin Francisco (used until: 10 Jan 1985 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Valencia, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. & M. Navarro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 19 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Access Services Canada Inc 854 Upper Canada Drive Sarnia ON N7W 1A4 1 800 971 8038 (p) 1 800 928 2503 (f) into@rasci.ca
Date Received: 11 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jan 2018