Navarro Kunstmann, Oscar Mauricio (CPSO#: 71030)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Apr 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Apr 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Catholic University of Chile, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6939
Fax: (416) 813-8389
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 17 Apr 2001 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Mar 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Oct 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Oscar Mauricio Navarro Kunstmann may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Medical  Imaging, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Navarro  Kunstmann  holds  a  geographical  full-time  teaching  or
                        research appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required  by the teaching or research requirements of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of registration  will  automatically  expire  when  Dr.
                  Navarro Kunstmann no  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause
                  1.