Navarro, Margaret Elizabeth (CPSO#: 28157)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: Ruiz-Navarro, Margaret Elizabeth (used until: 26 Oct 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. & M. Navarro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Navarro ( CPSO# 28144 )
Dr. M. Navarro ( CPSO# 28157 )

Business Address:
237 Argyle Street
Suite 201
Ottawa ON  K2P 1B8
Phone Number: (613) 238-7913

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Access Services Canada Inc 854 Upper Canada Drive Sarnia ON N7W 1A4 1 800 971 8038
Date Received: 11 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jan 2018