Nawaz, Ahmad (CPSO#: 31963)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Glasgow, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS, 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6, 1-(888)563-3732
Date Received: 13 Aug 2015


Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Incorporated 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Telephone: (416)-398-0638 Fax: (416)-342-1052 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 23 Oct 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015