Nawrocka, Joanna (CPSO#: 80261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Oct 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Poznan, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2431
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanna Nawrocka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nawrocka ( CPSO# 80261 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-2431

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Oct 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Oct 2003 to 07 Nov 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 08 Nov 2003 to 07 Nov 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 08 Nov 2004 to 09 Oct 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Nov 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Oct 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Joanna Nawrocka may practice medicine independently in Anaesthesia, limited
            to Paediatric patients.