Nay, Derek Wayne (CPSO#: 76285)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Simcoe Muskoka
Regional Cancer Program
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43333
Fax: (705) 739-5619
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hansen Nay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hansen ( CPSO# 76170 )
Dr. D. Nay ( CPSO# 76285 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
5 Quarry Ridge
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 728-3766

Business Address:
Simcoe Muskoka Regional Cancer Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 739-5661

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK WAYNE NAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2006