Nayak, Kumbla Naresh Kumar (CPSO#: 55534)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2009