Naylor, Nancy Lynne (CPSO#: 28305)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nancy Lynne Naylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 377 Park Street, Strathroy, ON N7G 3H5
Date Received: 19 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016