Nayot, Dan (CPSO#: 86503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
655 Bay St
Suite 1101
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4
Phone: 416-506-0804
Fax: 416-506-0600
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nayot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nayot ( CPSO# 86503 )

Business Address:
655 Bay Street
Suite 1101
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4
Phone Number: (416) 972-0110

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAN NAYOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYOT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012