Nazar, Gregory Bohdan (CPSO#: 51452)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1988