Nazarnia, Soheyla (CPSO#: 70629)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian, Turkish

Education:Hacettepe University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012