Nazerali Sunderji, Najmi (CPSO#: 57974)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 May 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999