Neame, Peter Dion Brereton (CPSO#: 67078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pediatric Urgent Care
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M0N2
Phone: 905 847 5437
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dion Neame Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Neame ( CPSO# 67078 )

Business Address:
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2
Phone Number: (905) 847-5437

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER DION BRERETON NEAME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEAME is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993