Nechala, Patrik (CPSO#: 78567)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7105
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 371-8311
Fax: (519) 371-8365
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrik Nechala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Nechala ( CPSO# 78567 )

Business Address:
7105 - 1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 371-8311

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 26 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRIK NECHALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NECHALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Oct 2002 to 28 Oct 2002
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2006