Nedic, Igor (CPSO#: 54294)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone: (519) 344-8283
Fax: (519) 336-0459
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nedic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Nedic ( CPSO# 54294 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7T 1X4
Phone Number: (519) 344-8283

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IGOR NEDIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEDIC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1985