Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Nedzelski, Julian Michael (CPSO#: 22018)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Medical records for Dr. Nedzelski can be accessed by contacting the manager of the ENT Department at Sunnybrook Hospital, Oriana Canario, (416) 480-4142
Date Received: 25 Aug 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017