Nee, Aisling Amelia (CPSO#: 111321)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 26 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
DMOH Princess Margaret Cancer Centr
Ontario Power Generation Bldg.
700 University Ave, 6th Floor 6W096
Toronto ON M5G 1Z5
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5084
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AISLING AMELIA NEE may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. NEE is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. NEE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NEE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. NEE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. NEE ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. NEE ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 25 Mar 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018