Neelands, Patricia Jane (CPSO#: 56848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
34 Eglinton Ave West
Suite 337
Toronto ON  M4R 2H6
Phone: 416-456-1470
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-813-5807
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

235 Danforth Ave
Children's After Hours Clinic
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-3000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Instructions: For record information please go to Dr. Neelands website: www.drpatricianeelands.weebly.com
Date Received: 27 Mar 2014

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA JANE NEELANDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEELANDS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 1988