Neffati, Abdurrahman Abdulhafiz L (CPSO#: 86152)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2007 to 28 Jun 2007
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jan 2016
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016