Nefsky, Colman Henry (CPSO#: 86602)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Centre
Department of Mental Health
Room 5M29
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: (416) 530-6076
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Integrated Psychogeriatric Outreach
Program, York Region
194 Eagle St.
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1J6
Canada
Phone: 905-830-4444 Ext. 73472
Fax: 905-895-9001
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Nefsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nefsky ( CPSO# 86602 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Health Centre
Department of Mental Health
Room 5M29
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
194 Eagle Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1J6

Business Address:
Suite 1168
617 Victoria Street
Whitby ON  L1N 0E4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLMAN HENRY NEFSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEFSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 15 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012