Nehra, Lollita Juliette (CPSO#: 28655)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 07 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Sep 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: On October 27, 2009, the Executive Committee referred the matter of Dr. Nehra's incapacity to the Fitness to Practise Committee.

Concerns

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: November 18, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Lollita Juliette Nehra has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.