Neidert, Eric John (CPSO#: 66658)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department Of Critical Care
Medicine
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carleton Place District & Memorial
Hospital
211 Lake Ave East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 613-257-2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eric J. Neidert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Neidert ( CPSO# 66658 )

Business Address:
205 - 2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8R2
Phone Number: (613) 828-0896

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC JOHN NEIDERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEIDERT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
Resident 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1999