Neimatullah, Mohammad Abdulgader (CPSO#: 67654)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 May 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 25 Jan 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998