Nelson, Charles Andrew (CPSO#: 74161)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1999 to 31 Jul 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2000