Nelson, John Norman (CPSO#: 55513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nelson Medicine Professional Corp
301 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Phone: (807) 274-3287
Fax: (807) 274-7882
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nelson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nugent ( CPSO# 66632 )
Dr. S. Elkheir ( CPSO# 98789 )
Dr. J. Nelson ( CPSO# 55513 )
Dr. L. Jenks ( CPSO# 55667 )
Dr. B. Anderson ( CPSO# 69844 )
Dr. M. Halvorsen ( CPSO# 100103)
Dr. K. Eltawil ( CPSO# 97650 )
Dr. V. Patel ( CPSO# 108275)
Dr. M. Ruppenstein ( CPSO# 98445 )
Dr. M. Kowal ( CPSO# 100791)

Business Address:
301 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Phone Number: (807) 274-3287

Business Address:
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone Number: (807) 274-3261

Business Address:
1460 Idylwild Drive
RMB 2004 RR#2
Fort Frances ON  P9A 3M3

Business Address:
310 Nelson Street
Fort Frances ON  P9A 1B1
Phone Number: (807) 274-7708


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Nelson and Dr. L. Jenks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nelson ( CPSO# 55513 )
Dr. L. Jenks ( CPSO# 55667 )

Business Address:
Nelson Medicine Professional Corp
301 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Phone Number: (807) 274-7741

Business Address:
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone Number: (807) 274-3266

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN NORMAN NELSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NELSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1986