Nelson, Michael Greggor (CPSO#: 70482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
847 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 3B4
Phone: (905) 544-5255
Fax: (905) 544-5155
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

267 Bay Thorn Drive
Thornhill ON  L3T 3V8
Canada
Phone: (905) 762-0404
Fax: (905) 762-0408
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

9 Progress Ave - Unit 1A
Toronto ON  M1P 5A4
Canada
Phone: (647) 725-9650
Fax: (416) 335-7796
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael G. Nelson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nelson ( CPSO# 70482 )

Business Address:
847 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 3B4
Phone Number: (905) 544-5255

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL GREGGOR NELSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NELSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998