Nelson, Sarah Louise (CPSO#: 84248)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Lung Health Centre
Suite 214
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-6079
Fax: (905) 858-8835
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Nelson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nelson ( CPSO# 84248 )

Business Address:
214 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-6079

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 04 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH LOUISE NELSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NELSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 27 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 28 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010