Nemani, Shantiprakash Suryanarayan (CPSO#: 86895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Telugu

Education:Government Medical College, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
94 Argyle Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1S9
Phone: (613) 432-3220
Fax: (613) 432-6370
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Fax: (613) 432-5293
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

St. Francis Memorial Hospital
Internal Medicine Clinic
7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
Phone: (613) 756-3044
Fax: (613) 756-0127
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nemani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nemani ( CPSO# 86895 )

Business Address:
94 Argyle Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1S9
Phone Number: (613) 432-3220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANTIPRAKASH SURYANARAYAN NEMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEMANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011