Nemni, Jacqueline Carole (CPSO#: 67040)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
207 Woolwich Street
Guelph ON  N1H 3V4
Phone: (519) 341-3344
Fax: (519) 341-4433
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacqueline Nemni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nemni ( CPSO# 67040 )

Business Address:
207 Woolwich Street
Guelph ON  N1H 3V4
Phone Number: (519) 341-3344

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE CAROLE NEMNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEMNI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Respirology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Respirology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 05 Sep 1997
Resident 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993