Nenshi, Rahima Nazir (CPSO#: 82789)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton, Ontario
L8N 4A6
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 33145
Fax: 905-521-6138
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rahima Nenshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nenshi ( CPSO# 82789 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Suite G836
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAHIMA NAZIR NENSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NENSHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011