Nesathurai, Shanker (CPSO#: 62259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1991


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 574-8515
Fax: (905) 575-2598
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Josephs Hospital
50 Charlton Ave East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton


Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. SHANKER NESATHURAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NESATHURAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991