Nesterenko, Maria (CPSO#: 89098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Crimean State Medical University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Phone: (905) 508-8876
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

180 Dundas Street West Ste. 1050
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 599-5991
Fax: (416) 599-1530
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Oleg Safir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nesterenko ( CPSO# 89098 )
Dr. O. Safir ( CPSO# 79962 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
600 University Avenue
Suite 476D1
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-2554


Corporation Name: Dr. Maria Nesterenko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nesterenko ( CPSO# 89098 )

Business Address:
9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Phone Number: (905) 508-8876

Business Address:
Suite 1050
180 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA NESTERENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NESTERENKO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 01 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2011