Nethirasigamani, Dinesh (CPSO#: 85925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nethirasigamani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nethirasigamani ( CPSO# 85925 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DINESH NETHIRASIGAMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NETHIRASIGAMANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 13 Apr 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 01 Feb 2008
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010