Neufeld, Keith Timothy (CPSO#: 63679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Imaging Department
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: 18664690822 Ext. 5120
Fax: (866) 469-0822
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Neufeld Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Neufeld ( CPSO# 63679 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Medical Imaging Department
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (866) 469-0822

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
North Shore Health Network Blind River
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH TIMOTHY NEUFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEUFELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1992